Babcock, Dena v. School District of Amery et al

Plaintiff: Dena Babcock
Defendant: School District of Amery and James Kuchta
Case Number: 3:2018cv00567
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Conference Order: # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to the Pleadings due 11/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due 5/17/2019. Settlement Letters due 9/13/2019. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 9/20/2019. Responses due 10/4/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/21/2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/31/2018. (arw)
August 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/29/2018 [:05] (skv)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Joint Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Plaintiff Dena Babcock. (Schoenberger, David)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James Kuchta, School District of Amery. Amended Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint. (Symes, Bryan)
July 23, 2018 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
July 23, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
July 23, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER by Defendants James Kuchta, School District of Amery. (Symes, Bryan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County Circuit Court, case number 18CV184. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2283280) Filed by School District of Amery, James Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint - Polk County Circuit Court, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Symes, Bryan) Modified on 7/20/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock, Dena v. School District of Amery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School District of Amery
Represented By: Bryan Timothy Symes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kuchta
Represented By: Bryan Timothy Symes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Babcock
Represented By: David Clark Schoenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?