Diamond Assets LLC v. E-Tech Asset LLC
Plaintiff: Diamond Assets LLC
Defendant: E-Tech Asset LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00568
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 22 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/12/2018. (kwf)
September 11, 2018 Filing 21 Joint MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Galster, Garet)
August 31, 2018 Filing 20 Declaration of Garet K. Galster filed by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Galster, Garet)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC in Support of #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Galster, Garet)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Response due from defendant to be served and filed on or before 8/30/2018. Reply due from plaintiff on any new matters raised by defendants to be served and filed on or before due 9/13/2018. Hearing on preliminary injunction will be held at 10:00 a.m. on 9/21/2018. Counsel for the parties shall consult and advise the court no later than 9/18/2018, whether they intend to call any witnesses at the hearing and, if so, who will be called. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/16/2018. (kwf)
August 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 8/16/2018 [:10] (mfh)
August 14, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2018 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
August 13, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER by Defendant E-Tech Asset LLC. (Kuehn, Cliff)
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant E-Tech Asset LLC. (Kuehn, Cliff)
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Cliff Kuehn for Defendant E-Tech Asset LLC. (Kuehn, Cliff)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 Declaration of Garet K. Galster filed by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC for Proof of Actual Notice re: 13 Text Only Order. (Galster, Garet)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** A short telephonic scheduling conference will be held on Thursday, August 16, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff is required to file proof of actual notice of this conference to the defendant or its counsel by the end of the day on Tuesday, 8/14. Plaintiff's counsel shall also initiate the call to the court at (608) 264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/10/2018. (kwf)
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. E-Tech Asset LLC served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Galster, Garet)
July 26, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa A Spindler for Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC. (Spindler, Melissa) Modified on 7/26/2018. (lak)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 Disregard. Modified on 7/25/2018. (lak)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff must promptly file proof of service of the summons, complaint, motion and supporting documents, as well as this order. Upon receipt of proof, the court will schedule a short scheduling conference to set appropriate deadlines for consideration of plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/23/2018. (kwf)
July 23, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (kwf)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to E-Tech Asset LLC. (kwf)
July 23, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
July 23, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC. (Galster, Garet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration of Garet K. Galster filed by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Former ETECH Website, #2 Exhibit B - Current ETECH Website, #3 Exhibit C - ETECH Trade In) (Galster, Garet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Michael McKenna filed by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Galster, Garet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Galster, Garet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC. (Galster, Garet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Diamond Assets LLC. (Galster, Garet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT with Unfair Competition Claims against E-Tech Asset LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2283538.), filed by Diamond Assets LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Galster, Garet) Modified on 7/23/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Assets LLC v. E-Tech Asset LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Tech Asset LLC
Represented By: Cliff Kuehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Assets LLC
Represented By: Garet K. Galster
Represented By: Melissa A Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?