Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades et al v. Surf Prep, Inc.

Plaintiff: District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO and Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Defendant: Surf Prep, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00590
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. (Driscoll, Robert) Modified on 9/24/2018. (lak)
September 6, 2018 Reset Hearings: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset from 9/19/2018 to 9/26/2018 at 2:30 PM at the request of counsel. Counsel for Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (kwf)
August 31, 2018 Filing 23 Declaration of Nathan D. Eisenberg filed by Plaintiffs District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades re: #3 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B - Print Outs from Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions Website) (Eisenberg, Nathan) Modified on 8/31/2018. (lak)
August 31, 2018 Filing 22 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades in Support of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Eisenberg, Nathan) Modified on 8/31/2018: Corrected event; termed reply deadline. (lak)
August 21, 2018 Filing 21 Affidavit of Heather L. Marotta filed by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re: #3 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Zawadsky, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 20 Affidavit of Nathan J. Troudt filed by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re: #3 Motion to Compel. (Zawadsky, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 19 Affidavit of Jonathon Grote filed by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re: #3 Motion to Compel. (Zawadsky, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 18 Affidavit of John H. Zawadsky filed by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re: #3 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - April 30, 2018 Surf-Prep Response to Unions' Informational Requests, #2 Exhibit 2 - June 13, 2018 Surf-Prep Response to Unions' Intent to Pursue Arbitration, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 22, 2018 Surf-Prep Response Regarding NLRB Precedent, #4 Exhibit 4 - July 5, 2018 Surf-Prep Response Regarding Arbitration, #5 Exhibit 5 - NLRB Petition filed August 9, 2018) (Zawadsky, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 17 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re: #3 Motion to Compel filed by District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades. (Zawadsky, John)
August 21, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 Combined ANSWER by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc., and Brief in Opposition re: #3 Motion to Compel. (Zawadsky, John) Modified on 8/20/2018: Brief in Opposition deadline terminated. (lak)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert S. Driscoll for Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. (Driscoll, Robert)
August 10, 2018 Filing 14 Amended Document by Plaintiff Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades. Amendment to #1 Complaint. Replacement Document to Docket No. 1-2, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA) (Eisenberg, Nathan) Modified on 8/10/2018. (lak)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. (Zawadsky, John)
August 6, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Returned Executed. Surf Prep, Inc. served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (Eisenberg, Nathan)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On July 30, defendant filed a motion, Dkt. #8 , to stay briefing on plaintiffs' motion to compel arbitration, Dkt. #3 , until it has been served. Now, defendant has notified the court that it was served on July 31 and requests 21 days to respond to plaintiffs' motion. Dkt. #10 . So the court will DENY defendant's motion to stay as moot. By August 21, defendant may file a brief in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to compel. Plaintiffs' reply is due by August 31. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/2/2018. (kwf)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 Notice by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re #3 Motion to Compel and Response deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 26, 2003 Order from Judge Crabb) (Zawadsky, John)
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 Notice (Cover Letter) by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. re: #8 Motion to Stay re: #3 Motion to Compel. (Zawadsky, John) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/31/2018). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: #1 Letter) (lak).
July 30, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Stay re: #3 Motion to Compel by Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. Response due 8/6/2018. (Zawadsky, John)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by John H. Zawadsky for Defendant Surf Prep, Inc. (Zawadsky, John)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration of Nathan D. Eisenberg filed by Plaintiffs District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades re: #3 Motion to Compel, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6/8/18 E-mail of Attorney Nathan Eisenberg, #2 Exhibit B - 7/3/18 E-mail of Attorney Nathan Eisenberg, #3 Exhibit C - 7/5/18 Letter from Attorney John Zawadsky) (Eisenberg, Nathan) Modified on 7/30/2018. (lak)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration of Adam Gifford filed by Plaintiffs District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades re: #3 Motion to Compel. (Eisenberg, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades. (Eisenberg, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO, Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 8/6/2018. (Eisenberg, Nathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Surf Prep, Inc. (kwf)
July 30, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
July 30, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Surf Prep, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2287901.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A - CBA (Also see #14 .), #3 Exhibit - Grievance, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Eisenberg, Nathan) Modified on 7/30/2018. (lak) Modified on 8/10/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades et al v. Surf Prep, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surf Prep, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Zawadsky
Represented By: Robert S. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No. 7 AFL-CIO
Represented By: Nathan Dane Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 802, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Nathan Dane Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?