Global Interactive Media, Inc. v. Titan TV, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Global Interactive Media, Inc.
Defendant: Titan TV, Inc. and Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00597
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 16 Declaration of Christopher Kelly filed by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. re: #15 Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions - Corporate Records, Titan TV, Inc.) (Hillyer, Gregory) Modified on 9/17/2018. (arw)
September 14, 2018 15 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 10/5/2018. Brief in Reply due 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Disregard. See #16 .) (Hillyer, Gregory) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak)
August 28, 2018 14 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Titan TV, Inc. answer due 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/28/2018. (arw)
August 27, 2018 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hillyer, Gregory)
August 27, 2018 12 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Gregory Loyde Hillyer Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2018. (lak)
August 27, 2018 11 Motion to Admit Gregory Loyde Hillyer Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2306924.) by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hillyer, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Titan TV, Inc. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Southard, Thomas)
August 7, 2018 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Seal, Brian)
August 6, 2018 8 Disregard. See #9 . Modified on 8/7/2018. (lak)
August 6, 2018 7 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (arw)
August 6, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Titan TV, Inc. and Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC) (arw)
August 6, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
August 6, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
August 3, 2018 5 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Brian S. Seal Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/3/2018. (lak)
August 3, 2018 4 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit Thomas Garner Southard Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/3/2018. (lak)
August 3, 2018 3 PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2291175) filed by Global Interactive Media, Inc. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,574,721, issued 08/11/2009, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc.; Patent # 8,032.907, issued 10/04/2011, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc.; Patent # 6,314,577, issued 11/06/2001, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,574,721, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,032,907, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,314,577, #5 Summons - Broadcast Interactive Media, #6 Summons - TitanTV, Inc., #7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Southard, Thomas) Modified on 8/3/2018. (lak)
August 2, 2018 2 Motion to Admit Brian S. Seal Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice fee $100, receipt number 0758-2291174) by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Seal, Brian)
August 2, 2018 1 Motion to Admit Thomas Garner Southard Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice fee $100, receipt number 0758-2291165) by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Southard, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Interactive Media, Inc. v. Titan TV, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan TV, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Loyde Hillyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Interactive Media, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Seal
Represented By: Thomas Garner Southard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?