Johns, Jason v. Leonard, Jack et al
Plaintiff: Jason E. Johns
Defendant: Jack Leonard and Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH")
Case Number: 3:2018cv00599
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH") answer due 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/18/2018. (nln),(ps)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Letter Requesting Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH"). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw),(ps)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff. Defendant Jack Leonard served via USPS on 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 USPS Response to Tracking Request, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff - defendant Military Order of the Purple Heart, U.S.A. served by USPS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Redacted copy of email attachment to #1 Complaint. (nln),(ps)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jack Leonard, Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH"). Summonses forwarded to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH"), #2 Procedure for Serving a Complaint on Individuals in a Federal Lawsuit, #3 Procedure for Serving a Complaint on a Corporation, Partnership or Unincorporated Association in a Federal Lawsuit) (nln/sp),(ps)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jack Leonard, Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH"), filed by Jason E. Johns. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34690032483.)(Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Email dated 6/27/18 with application and check attachments) (nln) Modified on 8/9/2018: Email attachment filed under seal due to D/O/B and bank account information listed in attachments. Redacted copy of email attachment is at dkt. #3 .) (nln).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns, Jason v. Leonard, Jack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Military Order of the Purple Heart of the U.S.A., Inc. ("MOPH")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?