Austin, Jeffrey et al v. London Road Rental Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda Austin and Jeffrey A. Austin
Defendant: AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center and London Road Rental Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00603
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Douglas
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 11 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulation to amend the caption (dkt. #9 ) is accepted and entered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/4/2018. (jls)
September 27, 2018 10 Brief in Opposition by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center re: #8 Motion to Hold Trial in Eau Claire filed by Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin. (Schmidt, Pamela) Modified on 9/27/2018. (lak)
September 25, 2018 9 Stipulation to Amend Caption by Plaintiffs Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin. (Bye, Charles)
September 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #8 Motion to Hold Trial in Eau Claire. Response due 9/28/2018. (jls)
September 21, 2018 8 Notice by Plaintiffs Jeffrey A. Austin, Linda Austin Requesting Trial Be Held in Eau Claire. (Bye, Charles) Modified on 9/24/2018. (lak)
September 17, 2018 7 Featured Case Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 11/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due 4/26/2019. Settlement Letters due 8/2/2019. Motions in Limine due 8/23/2019. Response to Motion due 9/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/17/2018. (jls)
September 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2018 [:10] (skv)
August 17, 2018 6 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela)
August 10, 2018 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
August 9, 2018 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela)
August 8, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 8, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 7, 2018 4 Certificate of Service by Defendants AXIS Insurance Company, Superior Rental Center as to #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Schmidt, Pamela)
August 7, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AXIS Insurance Company. (Schmidt, Pamela)
August 7, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Superior Rental Center. (Schmidt, Pamela)
August 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County Circuit Court, case number 18-CV-204. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2293687), filed by All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Substitution, #3 Exhibit C - Application and Order Glonek Approval, #4 Exhibit D - Application and Order Thimm Assigned, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F - Motion for Dismissal, Letter, Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit G - Order for Dismissal, #8 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmidt, Pamela) Modified on 8/7/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin, Jeffrey et al v. London Road Rental Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Austin
Represented By: Charles M. Bye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Austin
Represented By: Charles M. Bye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Rental Center
Represented By: Pamela M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Road Rental Center, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?