Goetsch, Colleen et al v. Town of Sanborn
Plaintiff: David Goetsch and Colleen Goetsch
Defendant: Town of Sanborn
Case Number: 3:2018cv00622
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Ashland
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 11/16/2018. Dispositive Motions due 6/14/2019. Settlement Letters due 11/1/2019. Motions in Limine due 11/8/2019. Response to Motion due 11/22/2019. Final Pretrial Submissions due 11/12/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 04:00 PM. Court Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/24/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00611-jdp et al. (voc)
September 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/21/2018 [:10] Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00611-jdp et al. (cak)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00611-jdp et al. (Huerter, John) Modified on 9/17/2018 (voc).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER Consolidating Cases Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/16/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00611-jdp et al. (voc)
August 8, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
August 8, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Case related to 18-cv-611-jdp. (voc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Town of Sanborn. (Bitar, Remzy)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Affidavit of Remzy D. Bitar re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer) (Bitar, Remzy)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ashland County Circuit Court, case number 18cv81. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2294659), filed by Town of Sanborn. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bitar, Remzy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goetsch, Colleen et al v. Town of Sanborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goetsch
Represented By: Skip Durocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Goetsch
Represented By: Skip Durocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Sanborn
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Represented By: R. Valjon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?