Huang, Zhi Xiong v. Nielsen, Kirstjen et al
Plaintiff: Zhi Xiong Huang
Defendant: Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen and Jeff Sessions
Case Number: 3:2018cv00664
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kristine Crandall served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018; Jeff Sessions served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Chien, David)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Zhi Xiong Huang. (Chien, David)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen, and Jeff Sessions. (jls)
August 13, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 13, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jeff Sessions, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2296786.), filed by Zhi Xiong Huang, (Attachments: #1 Summonses, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Disregard.) (Chien, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2018: #4 Exhibit A - ASC Appointment Notice, #5 Exhibit B - Case History, #6 Exhibit C - Letter dated June 29, 2016) (lak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang, Zhi Xiong v. Nielsen, Kirstjen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Crandall
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhi Xiong Huang
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?