Chazen v. Williams
Petitioner: Todd Richard Chazen
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Case Number: 3:2018cv00688
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:18-cv-02151. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
August 17, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Case transferred per August 14, 2018 order in case 17-cv-447-jdp. (elc)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/16/2018. (LPH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointed James S Becker for Todd Richard Chazen Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/16/2018. (LPH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue to Wisconsin for Entry of Judgment filed by Todd Richard Chazen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Becker, James) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Louis Williams, II. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kirkpatrick, Lisa) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel James Becker filed by Todd Richard Chazen. (Becker, James) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER/NOTICE to Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/7/2018. (MSK) cc: Chazen. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases. Case reassigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2151 ADM/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/31/2018. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 8/5/2018. (MMG) cc: Chazen. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Shelley Fite, Alice Green, Leslie Herje as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) Shelley Fite, Alice Green, Leslie Herje. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00447. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson per 3rd/4th Prisoner List. [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that petitioner Todd Richard Chazen's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota for the purpose of resentencing without regard to 18 U.S.C. 924(e). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/25/2018. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 16 Status Report (Notice of Supplemental Authority) by Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen, (Attachments: #1 Seventh Circuit Opinion) (Fite, Shelley),(ps) Modified on 5/18/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
April 29, 2018 Filing 15 Brief in Reply by Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen in Support of #12 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Van Cannon Opening Brief, #2 Exhibit - Van Cannon Response Brief, #3 Exhibit - Van Cannon Reply Brief) (Fite, Shelley),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
April 13, 2018 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal. Petitioner's Brief in Reply due 5/2/2018. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 14 Exhibit to #13 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Louis Williams, II. A - Presentence Investigation Report. (Sealed Document) (Green, Alice),(ps) Modified on 4/13/2018: No motion to seal was filed. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 13 Response to #12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal by Respondent Louis Williams, II, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Placeholder for Presentence Investigation Report, #2 Exhibit B - Minnesota Assault Conviction Records, #3 Exhibit C - Minnesota Drug Conviction Records, #4 Exhibit D - 8th Circuit Unpublished Opinion, Case No. 11-2523, #5 Exhibit E - 8th Circuit Briefs, Case No. 11-2523, #6 Exhibit F - Minnesota District Court Order Denying 2255 Motion, #7 Exhibit G - 8th Circuit Briefs, Case No. 16-2231, #8 Exhibit H - 8th Circuit Judgment, Case No. 16-2231) (Green, Alice),(ps) Modified on 4/13/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Todd Richard Chazen. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Drug Offense Docket, #2 Attachment B - Unredacted Shepard Document First Burglary, #3 Attachment C - Unredacted Shepard Document Second Burglary) (Fite, Shelley),(ps) Modified on 3/14/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Filing 11 Certified Mail Receipt of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Order, sent to Attorney General Jefferson Sessions. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipts of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #9 Order sent to Warden Louis Williams and U.S. Attorney. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting petitioner's #8 Motion for An Order Authorizing Release of Documents. Petitioner is GRANTED leave to conduct discovery to obtain documents related to his criminal proceeding. Service on respondent to be made via U.S. Certified mail. Petitioner may have until 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended petition or state that he declines to do so. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/7/2018. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2018: #1 Certified mail receipts) (jef). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for An Order Authorizing Release of Documents by Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. (Fite, Shelley),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley M Fite for Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. (Fite, Shelley),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 6 Financial Affidavit - CJA 23 by Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the court will appoint counsel for petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of this order and a Criminal Justice Act form 23 to petitioner. Petitioner must complete and file the CJA form 23 within four weeks from the date of this order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/28/2017. (jef/cc: petitioner w/ CJA form 23),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 4 Motion to Supplement #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal by Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter requesting the court to construe filing however appropriate, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
June 14, 2017 Filing fee received : $ 5.00, receipt number 34690029174 (elc),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen submit $5 fee or motion to proceed ifp along with Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/8/2017. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 2 Brief in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Todd Richard Chazen. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Todd Richard Chazen. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 7/25/2018.] [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chazen v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd Richard Chazen
Represented By: James S Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Williams, II
Represented By: Lisa D Kirkpatrick
Represented By: LeeAnn K. Bell
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?