Seidman, Helayne v. Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC

Plaintiff: Helayne Seidman
Defendant: Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00700
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 7 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Helayne Seidman. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC answer due 10/11/2018. (kwf)
September 25, 2018 6 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #5 Stipulation for Continuance of Answer or Rule 12 Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/25/2018. (kwf)
September 25, 2018 5 Stipulation for Continuance of Answer or Rule 12 Deadline by Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. (Jacobs, Jerilyn)
September 25, 2018 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jerilyn Jacobs for Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. (Jacobs, Jerilyn) Modified on 9/25/2018: Added the Attorney To Be Noticed designation and regenerated NEFs to counsel. (lak)
August 22, 2018 3 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (kwf)
August 22, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. (kwf)
August 22, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
August 22, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 21, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2304087.), filed by Helayne Seidman, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - Article, #3 Exhibit C - Copyright Catalog, #4 Exhibit D - Articles, #5 Summons, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/21/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seidman, Helayne v. Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC
Represented By: Jerilyn Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helayne Seidman
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?