Chesemore, Carol et al v. Fenkell, David
Plaintiff: Carol Chesemore, Thomas Gieck, Nannette Stoflet, Daniel Donkle and Martin Robbins
Defendant: David B. Fenkell
Case Number: 3:2018cv00724
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant David B. Fenkell. David B. Fenkell waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Horwitz, Julia)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Julie Selesnick Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/12/2018. (lak)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Julie Selesnick Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2317647.) by Plaintiffs Carol Chesemore, Daniel Donkle, Thomas Gieck, Martin Robbins, Nannette Stoflet. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Selesnick, Julie)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Julia Ann Horwitz Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/6/2018. (lak)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to Admit Julia Ann Horwitz Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2313338.) by Plaintiffs Carol Chesemore, Daniel Donkle, Thomas Gieck, Martin Robbins, Nannette Stoflet. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Horwitz, Julia)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David B. Fenkell. (jat)
August 30, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
August 30, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David B. Fenkell. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2309938.), filed by Carol Chesemore, Daniel Donkle, Martin Robbins, Nannette Stoflet, Thomas Gieck, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for David B. Fenkell) (Erlandson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chesemore, Carol et al v. Fenkell, David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Fenkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Chesemore
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Represented By: Julia Ann Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gieck
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Represented By: Julia Ann Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannette Stoflet
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Represented By: Julia Ann Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Donkle
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Represented By: Julia Ann Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Robbins
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Represented By: Julia Ann Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?