Tenaha Licensing, LLC v. Singlewire Software, LLC

Plaintiff: Tenaha Licensing, LLC
Defendant: Singlewire Software, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00728
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 5 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Singlewire Software, LLC. (kwf)
October 31, 2018 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Tenaha Licensing, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 26, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf)
September 6, 2018 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf)
September 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Singlewire Software, LLC. (kwf)
September 6, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
September 6, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 5, 2018 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against Singlewire Software, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2312593.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8,238,869, issued 08/07/2012, held by Tenaha Licensing LLC, filed by Tenaha Licensing, LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Patent 8,238,869) (Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 9/5/2018: Removed duplicate text. Added exhibit description. E-mail sent to counsel. Also see 18-cv-498. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenaha Licensing, LLC v. Singlewire Software, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenaha Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singlewire Software, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?