Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. v. Streamline Integrated Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Nicholas T. Lee, Streamline Integrated Solutions, LLC and Seanna E. Lee
Case Number: 3:2018cv00735
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Record by Rock County Circuit Court. (jat)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Record sent to Rock County Circuit Court. (jat)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of defendants' motion to withdraw the notice of removal (dkt. #5 ), which is unopposed. Accordingly, this motion is GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to REMAND this case to the Circuit Court of Rock County, Wisconsin and CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/10/18. (jat)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal by Defendants Nicholas T. Lee, Seanna E. Lee, Streamline Integrated Solutions, LLC. Response due 10/9/2018. (Wiczer, Elliot)
October 1, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. (Brydges, Joseph)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court and for Award of Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 10/1/2018. Brief in Reply due 10/11/2018. (Brydges, Joseph)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Streamline Integrated Solutions, LLC. (Wiczer, Elliot)
September 5, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
September 5, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Rock County, WI, case number 2018 CV 0000826, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2312937), filed by All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wiczer, Elliot) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/5/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #2 Exhibit A - Complaint) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. v. Streamline Integrated Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: John J. D'Attomo
Represented By: Joseph D. Brydges
Represented By: Adam Ethan Witkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas T. Lee
Represented By: Elliot Wiczer
Represented By: John Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streamline Integrated Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Elliot Wiczer
Represented By: John Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seanna E. Lee
Represented By: Elliot Wiczer
Represented By: John Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?