United States of America v. $18,627.00 U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $18,627.00 U.S. Currency, Diamond Flag Pendant with Chain and $10,231.00 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Ian S. Ortega and Catrina A. Ortega
Case Number: 3:2018cv00740
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Last publication date 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Advertisement Certification Report) (Luehring, Heidi)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Claim of Catrina A. Ortega by Claimant Catrina A. Ortega. (Gonzalez, Jason) Modified on 10/29/2018. (lak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Claim of Ian S. Ortega by Claimant Ian S. Ortega. (Gonzalez, Jason) Modified on 10/29/2018. (lak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Carlos Gonzalez for Claimants Ian S. Ortega and Catrina A. Ortega. (Gonzalez, Jason) Modified on 10/29/2018. (lak)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 Notice by Plaintiff United States of America of Substitution of Counsel, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Luehring, Heidi) Modified on 10/25/2018. (lak)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (kwf)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/18/2018. (kwf)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Trillo, Antonio)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant) (Trillo, Antonio)
September 10, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
September 10, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Jacob Reitz re: #1 Complaint. (Trillo, Antonio)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Trillo, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $18,627.00 U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,627.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Flag Pendant with Chain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,231.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ian S. Ortega
Represented By: Jason Carlos Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Catrina A. Ortega
Represented By: Jason Carlos Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?