Greybuffalo, Johnson v. Boughton, Gary et al
Plaintiff: Johnson W. Greybuffalo
Defendant: James LaBelle, Nurse Tracy, Gary Boughton, Sandra McArdle and Jolinda Waterman
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2018cv00776
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Sandra McArdle, James LaBelle, Tracy, Gary Boughton, Jolinda Waterman. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/6/2018. (jef),(ps)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/24/2018. (jef),(ps)
September 24, 2018 PRLA Screening of Complaint. (jef),(ps)
September 24, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 34690032861. (jef),(ps)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 E-filing packet) (jef),(ps)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Johnson W. Greybuffalo. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greybuffalo, Johnson v. Boughton, Gary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson W. Greybuffalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?