Standard Process, Inc. v. Clement, Terry et al

Plaintiff: Standard Process, Inc.
Defendant: Lourdes Clement and Terry Clement
Case Number: 3:2018cv00796
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 9 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal) (jat)
November 9, 2018 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jat)
November 9, 2018 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Standard Process, Inc. (Maher, Ann) Modified on 11/9/2018: The attached Certificate of Service indicates that the document was filed September 24, 2018. (lak)
November 9, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to file proof of service. (jat)
October 11, 2018 7 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jat)
October 10, 2018 6 Notice by Plaintiff Standard Process, Inc. of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) (Maher, Ann)
October 10, 2018 Second Action Request: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by October 12, 2018. (jat)
September 28, 2018 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (jat)
September 25, 2018 5 Summons Reissued as to Defendants Lourdes Clement, Terry Clement. (jat)
September 25, 2018 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Standard Process, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons for Lourdes Clement) (Maher, Ann) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak)
September 24, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Lourdes Clement, Terry Clement. (jat)
September 24, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
September 24, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
September 24, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Standard Process, Inc. (Maher, Ann) Modified on 9/25/2018: Case number. (lak)
September 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive and Other Relief for Violation of 15 USC 1114; 15 USC 1125(a); and Related Claims against Lourdes Clement, Terry Clement, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2325290.), filed by Standard Process, Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Terry Clement, #3 Summons to Lourdes Clement) (Maher, Ann) Modified on 9/24/2018: Case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Process, Inc. v. Clement, Terry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Process, Inc.
Represented By: Ann M. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?