United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin v. Cranberry Growers Cooperative
Appellee: Cranberry Growers Cooperative
Appellant: United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00823
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. This matter will be held in abeyance pending resolution of the pending petitions for direct review. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/28/2018. (jls)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion to Stay by Appellant United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Appellant's Petition for Direct Review with Addendum and Attachments, #2 Exhibit 2 - Appellee's Petition for Direct Review) (Sakata, Sumi)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Transcript from Bankruptcy Court of Hearing on Objection by the Debtor to Administrative Claim of the Office of the U.S. Trustee held on 8/28/2018; filed in Bankruptcy Court on 10/16/2018. (jls)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Appeal Record from Bankruptcy Court case number 17-13318. Documents from the Bankruptcy case can be found #here. Brief in Support due 12/14/2018. Brief in Opposition due 1/14/2019. Brief in Reply due 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court docket, #2 Appellant's Statement of the Issues and Designation of Items for Record on Appeal) (jls)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sumi Sakata for Appellant United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin. (Sakata, Sumi)
October 5, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
October 5, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case 18-cv-538-bbc. (jls)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-13318-cjf. Filed by United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin, (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Decision, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin v. Cranberry Growers Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cranberry Growers Cooperative
Represented By: Peggy Hunt
Represented By: Justin M. Mertz
Represented By: Justin Michael Mertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Trustee for the Western District of Wisconsin
Represented By: Tiffany E. Rodriguez
Represented By: Sumi Sakata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?