United States of America v. Graveen, David et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Wendy Jorgensen, Lac Du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Cavalry SPV I, LLC and David M. Graveen
Case Number: 3:2018cv00838
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to David M. Graveen. (nln),(ps)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara),(ps)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Cavalry SPV I, LLC) (nln),(ps)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara),(ps)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara),(ps)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wendy Jorgensen. Wendy Jorgensen waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Oswald, Barbara),(ps)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant Wendy Jorgensen-Graveen-Gleason. (Attachments: #1 Findings of fact, conclusions of law and judgment of divorce, 07FA55, #2 Martial settlement agreement, 07FA55, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Lac Du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Lac Du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 12, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors. (kwf)
October 12, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. Filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 09.11.2006 Lease, #3 Exhibit B - 12.12.2006 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 12.12.2006 Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - Title Status Report, #6 Exhibit E - Indian Loan Guarantee Certificate, #7 Exhibit F - 12.16.2006 Assignment of Mortgage, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Right to Cure Default, #9 Exhibit H - 05.16.2008 Letter, #10 Exhibit I - Single Family Application for Insurance Benefits, #11 Exhibit J - Wire Transfer Receipt) (Oswald, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Graveen, David et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lac Du Flambeau Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Graveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?