Sierra Pacific Industries v. Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Sierra Pacific Industries
Defendant: Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00853
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #5 Stipulation for Defendant to answer or otherwise plead on or before December 21, 2018. Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/20/2018. (jls)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Stipulation for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead on or Before December 21, 2018 by Plaintiff Sierra Pacific Industries. (McDonald, Daniel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. (jls)
October 18, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
October 18, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Sierra Pacific Industries. (McDonald, Daniel)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2339532.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 8,561,365, issued 10/22/13, held by Sierra Pacific Industries, filed by Sierra Pacific Industries, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 365 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Kolbe Website, #3 Exhibit C - VistaLuxe Brochure, #4 Exhibit D - VistaLuxe Diagrams, #5 Exhibit E - Kolbe Product Lines Webpage, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (McDonald, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Pacific Industries v. Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolbe & Kolbe Millwork Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Pacific Industries
Represented By: Stephen Reid Howe
Represented By: Thomas Richard Johnson
Represented By: Daniel W. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?