PNC Bank, National Association v. Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc.
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00886
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Affidavit of Martin J. Wasserman filed by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association for Attorney Fees and Costs re: #9 Motion for Default Judgment, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Fees & Costs) (Mroczkowski, Steven) Modified on 12/20/2018. (lak)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Affidavit of Steven Arco filed by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association in Support re: #9 Motion for Default Judgment, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 3 - Payoff, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pay History) (Mroczkowski, Steven) Modified on 12/20/2018. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association as to #10 Affidavit, #9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc., #12 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit. (Mroczkowski, Steven)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 Disregard. See #15 . Modified on 12/20/2018. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 Affidavit of Steven D. Mroczkowski filed by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association in Support re: #9 Motion for Default Judgment. (Mroczkowski, Steven) Modified on 12/18/2018. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 Disregard. See #14 . Modified on 12/20/2018. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc. by Plaintiff PNC Bank, N.A. (Mroczkowski, Steven) Modified on 12/18/2018. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Set Hearing: Default Hearing set for 1/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 250 before District Judge William M. Conley. (jat)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc. (jat)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Affidavit of Steven D. Mroczkowski filed by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association re: #5 Motion for Entry of Default. (Mroczkowski, Steven)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association as to #5 Motion for Entry of Default as to Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc. (Mroczkowski, Steven)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Entry of Default as to Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc., by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Disregard., #2 Text of Proposed Order of Entry of Default) (Mroczkowski, Steven) Modified on 11/30/2018. (lak)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Mroczkowski, Steven)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association. (Mroczkowski, Steven)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc. (jat)
October 29, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
October 29, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2347332.), filed by PNC Bank, National Association, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mroczkowski, Steven) Modified on 10/29/2018. Main document replaced and additional attachment added: #3 Exhibit - Promissory Note and Mortgage) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Steven D Mroczkowski
Represented By: Martin J Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janesville Lodge No. 197, Loyal Order of Moose, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?