Kriemelmeyer, Frederick v. Kopp, Eric et al

Plaintiff: Frederick George Kriemelmeyer
Defendant: Barbara B. Crabb, Eric Kopp, Elizabeth G. Altman and Stephen L. Crocker
Case Number: 3:2018cv00892
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Addition to the #1 Verified Administrative Action by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
December 4, 2018 Civil case terminated for plaintiff's failure to pay the $400 filing fee. (nln),(ps)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of fraud and conspiracy on the part of the court and by use of the United States Mail by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Order, envelope, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Addition to the #1 Verified Administrative Action filed by Plaintiff Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Copy sent to Judge Crocker, #3 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff to submit $400 filing fee or a motion for ifp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/2/2018. (jef),(ps)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 Verified Administrative Action, filed by Frederick George Kriemelmeyer. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Principles of commercial law, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of political status, citizen status and allegience, #3 Exhibit 3 - Appointment affidavits, U.S. Code re oaths of justices and judges, and oath of office, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of ownership, records certification, birth certificate, Minnesota court rule 220, #5 Exhibit 6 - Letter from U.S. Dept. of Justice, #6 Copy of verified adminstrative action, #7 Envelopes) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kriemelmeyer, Frederick v. Kopp, Eric et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara B. Crabb
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Kopp
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth G. Altman
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Crocker
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick George Kriemelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?