Gregerson, Stephen et al v. Walker, Scott et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Scot Gregerson and Debra Kim Gregerson
Defendant: Scott Needham, Scott Walker, Scott Knudson, Denise Anderson, Richard G. Chandler, Dallas S. Neville, Rob R. Stafsholt, Glenda J. Lyons, William M. Conley, Michael A. Schumacher, Ron Cramer and Sean Duffy
Case Number: 3:2018cv00911
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Civil case terminated for plaintiffs' failure to pay the $400 filing fee. (nln),(ps)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Affidavit of Non Response of Ana Gregerson. (jef),(ps)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Affidavit of Non Response of Kyle Gregerson. (jef),(ps)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Default and Imminent Liability Concerning Involuntary Servitude filed by Stephen Scot Gregerson, Debra Kim Gregerson (Attachments: #1 Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit A - Voice message, 11/16/18, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Affidavit of Non Response of Ana Gregerson re #5 Miscellaneous Pro se Filing. (rks),(ps)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Affidavit of Non Response of Kyle Gregerson re #5 Miscellaneous Pro se Filing. (rks),(ps)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Fault and Opportunity to Cure Liability Regarding Involuntary Servitude by Plaintiffs Debra Kim Gregerson, Stephen Scot Gregerson. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Lading, #2 Cover Letter) (rks),(ps)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing plaintiffs to pay the $400 filing fee or financial affidavits by 11/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/8/2018. (jef),(ps)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Affidavit of Debra Kim Gregerson. (jef),(ps)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Affidavit of Stephen Scot Gregerson. (jef),(ps)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Liability Regarding Involuntary Servitude / COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Amended pages, #2 Bill of landing, #3 CD filed conventionally, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregerson, Stephen et al v. Walker, Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Scot Gregerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kim Gregerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Knudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas S. Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob R. Stafsholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda J. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?