Mayr, Taylor v. Husky Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Mayr
Defendant: Superior Refining Company, LLC and Husky Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00917
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Francisco Guerra, IV Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/6/2018. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Jorge Luiz Mares Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/6/2018. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit Shalimar Simon Wallis Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/6/2018. (lak)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to Admit Francisco Guerra, IV Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2371801.) by Plaintiff Taylor Mayr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Guerra, Francisco)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Jorge Luiz Mares Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2371779.) by Plaintiff Taylor Mayr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Mares, Jorge)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Shalimar Simon Wallis Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2371771.) by Plaintiff Taylor Mayr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Wallis, Shalimar)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Superior Refining Company, LLC, Husky Energy, Inc. Waiver sent on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. (lak)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Disregard. Modified on 12/3/2018. (lak)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Taylor Mayr. (Yira, Markus) Modified on 11/26/2018. (lak)
November 19, 2018 Case reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley. See Related Case 18-cv-697-wmc. Case no longer assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson. (arw)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of diversity of citizenship due 11/26/2018. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/9/2018. (arw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Husky Energy, Inc. and Superior Refining Company, LLC. (arw)
November 8, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
November 8, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2354505) filed by Taylor Mayr. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Husky Energy, Inc. & Superior Refining Company LLC) (Yira, Markus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayr, Taylor v. Husky Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Refining Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husky Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Mayr
Represented By: Markus Clarence Yira
Represented By: Shalimar Simon Wallis
Represented By: Jorge Luiz Mares
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?