Farmer, John v. The City of Superior, Wisconsin et al

Plaintiff: John Farmer
Defendant: The City of Superior, Wisconsin, Adam Poskozim, George Gothner and Jeff Harriman
Case Number: 3:2018cv00939
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge Stephen L. Crocker attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 3/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due 8/30/2019. Settlement Letters due 12/20/2019. Motions in Limine due 1/6/2020, Responses due 1/17/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 3:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/11/2019. (kwf)
January 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/10/2019 [:10] (cak)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendants) (lak)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 Joint Discovery Plan. (Olson, Jeff)
December 10, 2018 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 12/27/2018. (kwf)
December 10, 2018 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER by Defendants George Gothner, Jeff Harriman, Adam Poskozim, The City of Superior, Wisconsin. (Gunta, Gregg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Garrett Matthew Gondik for Plaintiff John Farmer. (Gondik, Garrett)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants George Gothner, Jeff Harriman, Adam Poskozim, The City of Superior, Wisconsin. (Gunta, Gregg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jeff Harriman. Jeff Harriman waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gunta, Gregg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant George Gothner. George Gothner waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gunta, Gregg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant The City of Superior, Wisconsin. The City of Superior, Wisconsin waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gunta, Gregg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Adam Poskozim. Adam Poskozim waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Gunta, Gregg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregg J. Gunta for Defendants George Gothner, Jeff Harriman, Adam Poskozim, The City of Superior, Wisconsin, (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Gunta, Gregg) Modified on 11/20/2018. (lak)
November 15, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
November 15, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2358895.) Filed by John Farmer, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Jeff) Modified on 11/15/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer, John v. The City of Superior, Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Farmer
Represented By: Jeff Scott Olson
Represented By: Garrett Matthew Gondik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Superior, Wisconsin
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Poskozim
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gothner
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Harriman
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?