Sadowski, Christopher v. Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC

Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00946
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 OPINION AND ORDER denying #12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/11/19. (jat)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint, Dkt. #9 , and in response defendant has renewed its motion to dismiss. Dkt. #12 . The court will DENY defendant's motion to dismiss the no-longer-operative complaint, Dkt. #8 , as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/9/2019. (arw)
January 9, 2019 12 MOTION TO DISMISS First Amended Complaint by Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 1/30/2019. Brief in Reply due 2/11/2019. (Wallo, William)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Robert Penchina Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/27/2018. (lak)
December 27, 2018 10 Motion to Admit Robert Penchina Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2382797.) by Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Penchina, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
December 26, 2018 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC, filed by Christopher Sadowski, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo of Burger King, #2 Exhibit B - NYPost Article, #3 Exhibit C - US Copyright Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Infringing Article by Defendant) (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 26, 2018 8 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 1/16/2019. Brief in Reply due 1/28/2019. (Wallo, William)
December 26, 2018 7 Notice of Appearance filed by William E. Wallo for Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. (Wallo, William)
December 26, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. (Wallo, William)
December 12, 2018 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (lak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Declaration of Server) (jat).
December 11, 2018 4 Disregard. Wrong date entered. See #5 for correct entry. Modified on 12/12/2018. (lak)
November 26, 2018 3 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (jat) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/26/2018) (jat).
November 26, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC. (jat)
November 26, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
November 26, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
November 25, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2364525.), filed by Christopher Sadowski, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo of Burger King, #2 Exhibit B - News Article, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Registration, #4 Exhibit D - News Article, #5 Summons, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 11/26/2018. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski, Christopher v. Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Valley Broadcasters, LLC
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Represented By: William E. Wallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?