United States of America v. Hoff, Jesse
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Jesse Hoff
Case Number: 3:2018cv00985
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Marshal Service Return Executed re: #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, #2 Declaration, #3 Order to Show Cause. (jat)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause Issued. Materials returned to government for service. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/4/18. (jat)
November 30, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
November 30, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Bart Brellenthin filed by Petitioner United States of America re: #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Humphrey, Richard)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Placeholder for Declaration of Bart Brellenthin, #2 Exhibit 2 - November 28, 2017 IRS Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 26, 2018 IRS Summons, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Order to Show Cause) (Humphrey, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hoff, Jesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jesse Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?