American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. and John A. Klucarich
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv01004
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. United States of America served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Disregard. Modified on 12/28/2018. (lak)
December 12, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
December 12, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2374246.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mundt, Rick) Modified on 12/11/2018: Corrected parties. Complaint is missing case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Rick J. Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Klucarich
Represented By: Rick J. Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?