Dalton, Aaron v. Johnson, David et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Defendant: Sandra K. Thibodo-Johnson and David M. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01007
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
January 29, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 2/5/2019. (lak)
January 11, 2019 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
January 8, 2019 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants David M. Johnson, Sandra K. Thibodo-Johnson. (Skinner, Carol)
December 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to David M. Johnson, Sandra K. Thibodo-Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Sandra K. Thibodo-Johnson) (arw)
December 6, 2018 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
December 6, 2018 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2371519) filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photograph, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Browne, Padraigin) Modified on 12/6/2018: Complaint and summonses are missing the case number. Added exhibit description. Called counsel's office re: describing all future exhibits. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton, Aaron v. Johnson, David et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra K. Thibodo-Johnson
Represented By: Carol N. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Johnson
Represented By: Carol N. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?