Van Caster, Michael v. Wisconsin Department Of Natural Resources

Plaintiff: Michael Van Caster
Defendant: Wisconsin Department Of Natural Resources
Case Number: 3:2018cv01009
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court has given plaintiff until January 23, 2019 to submit an amended complaint. Plaintiff has filed a motion for a six-month extension of that deadline, dkt. #8 , stating that he has limited legal knowledge and limited law library time. This court does not grant six month extensions for the purpose of amending a complaint. Plaintiff should not not need this much time to comply with this court's order. The court told plaintiff what he must do: either name as defendants the individuals who were personally involved in providing unsafe water at FLCI, or explain how a state policy or state custom created the that led to the unsafe water problem. I will give plaintiff six more weeks to do this, so his motion is GRANTED IN PART: plaintiff has until February 25, 2019, to submit his amended complaint. Otherwise, plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss this case without prejudice and refile his amended complaint whenever he is ready. Doing this, however, would require plaintiff to pay a second filing fee, so it would not be a cost-free proposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/14/2019. (nln),(ps)
January 10, 2019 8 Motion for Extension of January 23, 2019 Deadline, by Plaintiff Michael Van Caster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint. ( Amendments to Pleadings due 1/23/2019. ) Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 01/03/2019. (rks),(ps)
December 26, 2018 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Partial Filing fee received: $ 1.56, receipt number 34690033514. (jef),(ps)
December 17, 2018 5 Letter Regarding Filing Fee from Plaintiff Michael Van Caster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kwf), (ps)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.56 assessed due 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/06/2018. (rks),(ps)
December 6, 2018 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Michael Van Caster (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
December 6, 2018 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Van Caster. (rks),(ps)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Department Of Natural Resources, filed by Michael Van Caster. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Caster, Michael v. Wisconsin Department Of Natural Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department Of Natural Resources
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Van Caster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?