Kolmorgen, Matthew v. McComiskey, A.

Plaintiff: Matthew Kolmorgen
Defendant: A. R. McComiskey
Case Number: 3:2018cv01010
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant A. R. McComiskey. (Freehill, Leslie)
January 17, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
January 10, 2019 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant A. R. McComiskey. (Pines, Lester)
December 7, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to A. R. McComiskey. (kwf)
December 7, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
December 7, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
December 6, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Matthew Kolmorgen. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against A. R. McComiskey, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2372080.), filed by Matthew Kolmorgen, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolmorgen, Matthew v. McComiskey, A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. R. McComiskey
Represented By: Lester A. Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Kolmorgen
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Represented By: Zeshan Usman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?