Boder, Brian et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Brian M. Boder and Toni L. Watterson
Defendant: AWR Enterprises, Inc., Elizabeth I. Juhl and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01015
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AWR Enterprises, Inc. answer due 2/6/2019; Elizabeth I. Juhl answer due 2/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/29/19. (jat)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AWR Enterprises, Inc., Elizabeth I. Juhl. (Dillon, Tracey)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants AWR Enterprises, Inc., Elizabeth I. Juhl. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Dillon, Tracey) Modified on 1/30/2019: Attachments. (lak)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracey Ann Dillon for Defendants AWR Enterprises, Inc., Elizabeth I. Juhl. (Dillon, Tracey)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Wells Fargo & Company answer due 2/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/17/2019. (jls)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wells Fargo & Company. (Spitz, Joel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Wells Fargo & Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Spitz, Joel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Joel Howard Spitz for Defendant Wells Fargo & Company. (Spitz, Joel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Elizabeth I. Juhl served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Godbe, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. AWR Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Godbe, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wells Fargo & Company served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Godbe, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AWR Enterprises, Inc., Elizabeth I. Juhl, Wells Fargo & Company. (jat)
December 10, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
December 10, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2372857.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Wells Fargo & Company, #3 Summons - AWR Enterprises, Inc., #4 Summons - Elizabeth I. Juhl) (Godbe, Michael) Modified on 12/10/2018: Counsels' address is missing from each summons. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boder, Brian et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWR Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey Ann Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth I. Juhl
Represented By: Tracey Ann Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Joel Howard Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M. Boder
Represented By: Nicholas E. Fairweather
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Represented By: Michael Godbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni L. Watterson
Represented By: Nicholas E. Fairweather
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Represented By: Michael Godbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?