Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. and Purdue Pharma L.P.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01017
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's decision on Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa's motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. The parties must notify this court within three days of the JPML's decision. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/17/2019. (arw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa in Support of #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Frazer, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. re: #4 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. (O'Neill, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 Brief in Reply by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in Support of #7 Motion to Stay. (O'Neill, Matthew)
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 Brief in Reply by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. in Support of #11 MOTION for Extension of Time. (O'Neill, Matthew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Frazer, Thomas)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Purdue's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 1/3/2019. (O'Neill, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 12/21/2018 [:15] (cak)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Stipulation to and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/21/18. (jat)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa re: #7 Motion to Stay, filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Frazer, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The December 21, 2018 telephonic hearing turned into a status call, with both sides providing information to the court about how they would like this case to proceed. Plaintiff expressed a wish to respond to defendants' December 20 motion to stay (dkt. #7 ) and reported that it could file that response today (December 21). Defendants may reply by January 4, 2019. The court then will promptly rule on this motion and will advise the parties whether it intends to decide plaintiff's motion to remand (dkt. #4 ) or defer to Judge Polster in the event this case is finally transferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/21/18. (jat)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to the Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Response due 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transferred Tribal Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-72), #3 Exhibit 3 - County of Floyd Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Northern Dist. of Ohio Case Management Order One, #5 Exhibit 5 - Robinson Rancheria Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware County Opinion and Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - St. Bernard Parish Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - County of San Mateo Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Village of Melrose Park Order) (O'Neill, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2018. (lak)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Sara Roitman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/20/2018. (lak)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Sara Roitman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2379977.) by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Roitman, Sara)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court and Brief in Support by Plaintiff Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa. Brief in Opposition due 1/4/2019. Brief in Reply due 1/14/2019. (Frazer, Thomas)
December 14, 2018 Set Status Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (arw/slc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Stipulation to and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Neill, Matthew) Modified on 12/13/2018. (lak)
December 10, 2018 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
December 10, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (O'Neill, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the County of Ashland, Wisconsin, case number 2018CV000182. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2373350) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Case Summary, #6 Exhibit 6 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, United States District Court, District of New Mexico) (O'Neill, Matthew) Modified on 12/10/2018: Added exhibit descriptions. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2018: #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Represented By: Sara Roitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Represented By: Sara Roitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Represented By: Sara Roitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bad River Band of Lake Superior Chippewa
Represented By: Erick John Arnold
Represented By: Thomas Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?