Bank of New York Mellon v. Glavin, John et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners, John A. Glavin, Citibank (South Dakota) N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., United States of America, Wisconsin River Co-Op Services and Gabrielle Glavin
Case Number: 3:2018cv01038
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon in Support of #4 Motion to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Cummings, Shannon),(ps)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Brief in Opposition by Defendant John A. Glavin re: #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #4 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court and for Fees and Costs. Defendants' Brief in Opposition due 1/16/2019. Plaintiff's Brief in Reply due 1/28/2019. (nln),(ps)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court and for Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Cummings, Shannon),(ps)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Record from Juneau County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet, 09cv342) (jef),(ps) Clerk's office note; paper record filed conventionally and located in the clerk's office exhibit room. (jef)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Jurisdictional Memorandum in support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant John A. Glavin. (jef),(ps)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Juneau County, case number 09cv342. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34690033442), filed by John A. Glavin. (Attachments: #1 State court case 09-cv-342 pleadings, orders, correspondence) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Glavin, John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Gunar John Blumberg
Represented By: Cord J Harris
Represented By: Darice C. Hermann
Represented By: Shannon K. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Glavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Megan McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin River Co-Op Services
Represented By: Stephen D. Chiquoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle Glavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?