Arion, L.L.C. v. LMLC Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arion, L.L.C.
Defendant: Todd Barnhardt and LMLC Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01053
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The motion to withdraw by defendants' attorneys (dkt. #38 ) is GRANTED. Defendants have until February 25, 2019 for new counsel to file an appearance on their behalf. The telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is moved to March 8, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/23/2019. (jls)
January 22, 2019 Filing 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (O'Brien, Timothy)
January 9, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy J. O'Brien for Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (O'Brien, Timothy)
January 9, 2019 Filing 36 Disregard. Modified on 1/9/2019. (lak)
January 9, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy J. O'Brien for Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (lak)
January 9, 2019 Filing 34 Disregard. Modified on 1/9/2019. (lak)
January 7, 2019 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
January 4, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. (Reinhardt, Peter)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas David Strom withdrawn from the case. Defendants are to retain replacement counsel forthwith so that this case may proceed toward just, speedy and inexpensive resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/21/2018. (jls)
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. Response due 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notification of Party Contact Information) (Strom, Nicholas) Modified on 12/21/2018. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
December 18, 2018 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
December 18, 2018 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05904. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Wisconsin, Eau Claire Division the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/14/18.Mailed notice(ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:For the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion and order, Defendants' motion to transfer #13 is granted. The Court hereby transfers this case forthwith to the Western District of Wisconsin, Eau Claire Division. This case is terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. to motion to transfer case #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Arion, L.L.C. re response in opposition to motion #24 (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Arion, L.L.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. to transfer case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 23 Joint Status Report by Arion, L.L.C. (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for extension of time to answer complaint 21 days after the Court's ruling on Defendant's motion to transfer #18 is granted. Motion to continue the status hearing #19 is granted. The status hearing set for 10/25/18 is reset to 12/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas David Strom for presentment of motion to continue #19 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas David Strom for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. to continue Initial Status Hearing (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 10/18/18 is reset to 10/25/18 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to transfer #13 shall be due by 10/19/18; reply due by 11/2/18. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas David Strom for presentment of motion to transfer case #13 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/4/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. in support of motion to transfer case #13 Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. to transfer case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #11 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 10/2/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. for extension of time to Respond to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 10/18/18 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Arion, L.L.C. re attorney appearance #8 (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arion, L.L.C. by David C. Hurst (Hurst, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 29, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. by Nicholas David Strom (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LMLC Holdings, Inc. (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. re notice of removal, #1 (Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois Law Division, case number (18 L 7197) filed by Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Holdings, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14883137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strom, Nicholas) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/18/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arion, L.L.C. v. LMLC Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arion, L.L.C.
Represented By: David C. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Barnhardt
Represented By: Nicholas David Strom
Represented By: Peter M. Reinhardt
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMLC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas David Strom
Represented By: Peter M. Reinhardt
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?