Chen, Jian v. Nielsen, Kirstjen et al

Plaintiff: Jian Yun Chen
Defendant: Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen and Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00024
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit A to #1 Complaint, filed by Jian Yun Chen. Receipt Notice of Petition I-730, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Printout of Processing History of Petition I-730) (Chien, David) Modified on 1/30/2019. (lak)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kristine Crandall served on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019; Matthew Whitaker served on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Chien, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen, and Matthew Whitaker. (jls)
January 10, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
January 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Jian Yun Chen. (Chien, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristine Crandall, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew Whitaker, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2389992.) (Sealed Document), filed by Jian Yun Chen, (Attachments: #1 Summonses, #2 Disregard. See #5 ., #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chien, David) Modified on 1/10/2019. (lak) Modified on 1/30/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen, Jian v. Nielsen, Kirstjen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jian Yun Chen
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?