Bender, Joseph et al v. State of Wisconsin et al

Plaintiff: Tyler S. Holman, Joseph W. Bender, Jeremy W. Stroebel, Chelsea N. Cadotte, Thomas G. White, Jr., Tyler J. Hood, Peng N. Lor, Stanchelle L. Hankins, Aric A. Elmore, Cody L. Hansen, Homer D. Taylor, Jr., Bryant J. Swiggum and Lindsy Mason, Jr.
Defendant: Kelli S. Thompson, Anthony S. Evers and State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Haukaas, H.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony David Russomanno for Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. (Russomanno, Anthony)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 3/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/29/2019. (kwf)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Roth, Colin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Colin Thomas Roth for Defendants Anthony S. Evers, State of Wisconsin, Kelli S. Thompson. (Roth, Colin)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proof of Service as to Wisconsin Attorney General Joshua Kaul. (Haukaas, H.) Modified on 1/22/2019. (lak)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kelli S. Thompson served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Haukaas, H.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Anthony S. Evers served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Haukaas, H.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Anthony S. Evers, #2 Summons Issued as to Kelli S. Thompson) (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
January 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391378.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Haukaas, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender, Joseph et al v. State of Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli S. Thompson
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony S. Evers
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Anthony David Russomanno
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler S. Holman
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Bender
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy W. Stroebel
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea N. Cadotte
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. White, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler J. Hood
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peng N. Lor
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanchelle L. Hankins
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aric A. Elmore
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody L. Hansen
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer D. Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant J. Swiggum
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsy Mason, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Blake Gross
Represented By: H. Craig Haukaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?