Lust, Minnie v. Kohn Law Firm, S.C. et al

Plaintiff: Minnie L. Lust
Defendant: Jason D. Hermersmann, Kohn Law Firm, S.C. and Kirk R. Emick
Case Number: 3:2019cv00032
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #11 Motion for Attorney Fees After Acceptance of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment. Brief in Opposition due 3/27/2019. Brief in Reply due 4/8/2019. (voc/jm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 Affidavit of DeVonna Joy filed by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust in Support re: #11 Motion for Attorney Fees, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C.V. for DeVonna Joy, #2 Exhibit B - Itemized Time Records For DeVonna Joy, #3 Exhibit C - E-mail to Dave Ambrosh, #4 Exhibit D - Vince Megna Affidavit in Broome v. Kohn, #5 Exhibit E - Susan Grzeskowiak Affidavit in Broome v. Kohn, #6 Exhibit F - Sidney Wilcox Affidavit in Broome v. Kohn, #7 Exhibit G - Mariann Schultz Affidavit in Broome v. Kohn) (Joy, DeVonna) Modified on 3/6/2019. (lak)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Nathan DeLadurantey filed by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust in Support re: #11 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Joy, DeVonna) Modified on 3/6/2019. (lak)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Mary Catherine Fons filed by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust re: #11 Motion for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C.V. for Mary Fons) (Joy, DeVonna)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Michael Godbe filed by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust re: #11 Motion for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Itemized Time Records, #2 Exhibit B - Nicholas E. Fairweather Declaration in Broome v. Kohn) (Joy, DeVonna) Modified on 3/6/2019. (lak)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust. (Joy, DeVonna)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Attorney Fees After Acceptance of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust. (Joy, DeVonna)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT in favor of Minnie L. Lust against Kohn Law Firm, S.C., Jason D. Hermersmann, and Kirk R. Emick in the amount of $7,000.00. (JDP/PAO) (kwf)
February 11, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kohn Law Firm, S.C. (Ambrosh, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by David A. Ambrosh for Defendants Kirk R. Emick, Jason D. Hermersmann, Kohn Law Firm, S.C. (Ambrosh, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment by Plaintiff Minnie L. Lust, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rule 68 Offer of Judgment) (Joy, DeVonna) Modified on 1/29/2019. (lak)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Disregard. See #7 . Modified on 1/29/2019. (lak)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Kirk R. Emick. Kirk R. Emick waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Godbe, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jason D. Hermersmann. Jason D. Hermersmann waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Godbe, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Kohn Law Firm, S.C. Kohn Law Firm, S.C. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Godbe, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kirk R. Emick, Jason D. Hermersmann, Kohn Law Firm, S.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jason D. Hermersmann, #2 Summons Kirk R. Emick) (voc)
January 14, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
January 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2391394.), filed by Minnie L. Lust, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Kohn Law Firm, S.C., #3 Summons - Jason D. Hermersmann, #4 Summons - Kirk R. Emick) (Godbe, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lust, Minnie v. Kohn Law Firm, S.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Hermersmann
Represented By: David A. Ambrosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohn Law Firm, S.C.
Represented By: David A. Ambrosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk R. Emick
Represented By: David A. Ambrosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie L. Lust
Represented By: DeVonna Joy
Represented By: Nicholas E. Fairweather
Represented By: Michael Godbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?