Poke, Nathan v. The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Nathan M. Poke
Defendant: Ron Tischer and The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00033
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Olson, Jeff)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendants) (lak)
March 5, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 3/12/2019. (lak)
February 15, 2019 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin, Ron Tischer. (Riordan, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher P. Riordan for Defendants The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin, Ron Tischer. (Riordan, Christopher)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Ron Tischer, The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin. (Riordan, Christopher) Modified on 2/4/2019. (lak)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin, Ron Tischer. (Olson, Jeff)
January 14, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
January 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2392274.) Filed by Nathan M. Poke, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Jeff) Modified on 1/15/2019: Updated defendant per complaint. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poke, Nathan v. The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Tischer
Represented By: Christopher P. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of La Crosse, Wisconsin
Represented By: Christopher P. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan M. Poke
Represented By: Jeff Scott Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?