Stietz, Robert v. Frost, Joseph et al

Plaintiff: Robert J. Stietz
Defendant: Nick Webster and Joseph J. Frost
Case Number: 3:2019cv00043
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: William M Conley
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Brief in Reply by Defendants Joseph J. Frost, Nick Webster in Support of #3 Motion to Dismiss. (Johnson - Karp, Gabe)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due 10/4/2019. Settlement Letters due 1/24/2020. Motions in Limine due 1/31/2020. Response to Motion due 2/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/16/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/26/2019. (jls)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Robert J. Stietz re: #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Nick Webster, Joseph J. Frost. (Morgan, Stephen) Modified on 2/25/2019. (lak)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Appendix) (Johnson - Karp, Gabe) Modified on 2/19/2019. (lak)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 2/22/2019. Brief in Reply due 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/12/2019. (jls)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Attorney Stephen L. Morgan filed by Plaintiff Robert J. Stietz re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Morgan, Stephen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Robert J. Stietz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Morgan, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Joseph J. Frost, Nick Webster. (Johnson - Karp, Gabe)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Joseph J. Frost, Nick Webster. Brief in Opposition due 2/14/2019. Brief in Reply due 2/25/2019. (Johnson - Karp, Gabe)
January 17, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
January 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Gabe Johnson-Karp re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Morgan Email) (Johnson - Karp, Gabe) Modified on 1/18/2019. (lak)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lafayette County, case number 18-CV-0086. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2394173), filed by All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint, Service, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson - Karp, Gabe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stietz, Robert v. Frost, Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Webster
Represented By: Luke Berg
Represented By: Gabe Johnson-Karp
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Frost
Represented By: Luke Berg
Represented By: Gabe Johnson-Karp
Represented By: Gabe Johnson - Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Stietz
Represented By: Stephen Lawrence Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?