Anderson, Jeanie v. Lands' End, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeanie Anderson
Defendant: Lands' End, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Lands' End, Inc. answer due 4/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/8/2019. (arw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant Lands' End, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hughes, William) Modified on 3/8/2019. (lak)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by William Edward Hughes, III for Defendant Lands' End, Inc. (Hughes, William)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Lands' End, Inc. Lands' End, Inc. waiver sent on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
January 18, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
January 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lands' End, Inc. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2394594) Filed by Jeanie Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kuklinski, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, Jeanie v. Lands' End, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lands' End, Inc.
Represented By: William Edward Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Anderson
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Kuklinski
Represented By: Aaron N. Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?