Holman, David v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Plaintiff: David Holman
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00048
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 1/19/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Hill, Adam)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (kwf)
January 18, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
January 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2394541.), filed by David Holman, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Hill, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman, David v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Holman
Represented By: Adam Theodore Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?