Ruhland, Jan v. Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department

Plaintiff: Jan Ruhland
Defendant: Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00072
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: Barbara B Crabb
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/26/2019 [:05] (skv)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phebus, Douglas)
February 22, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department. (Wistrom, Oyvind)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Phebus, Douglas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department. (arw)
January 30, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
January 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
January 30, 2019 Filing fee received: $400, receipt number 34690033758. (arw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department (Filing Fee Due) filed by Jan Ruhland. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruhland, Jan v. Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Highway & Transportation Department
Represented By: Oyvind Wistrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Ruhland
Represented By: Victor Manuel Arellano
Represented By: Douglas J. Phebus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?