Mutual of Wausau v. MVP Group International et al

Plaintiff: Mutual of Wausau and Mutual of Wausau Insurance Company
Defendant: Partylite Worldwide, Inc., MVP Group International, MVP Group International, Inc., Midwest-CBK, LLC and Partylite, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00078
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by Defendant MVP Group International, Inc. (Snider, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In response to this court's order, requiring plaintiff to file an amended complaint containing allegations sufficient to establish the citizenship of two of the three defendants, plaintiff filed a third amended complaint (1) removing Midwest-CBK, LLC as a defendant from the caption and allegations in the complaint and (2) changing the name of the other defendant previously identified as Partylite Worldwide, Inc., and Partylite Worldwide, LLC, to Partlite, Inc. (no Worldwide). (3d Am. Compl.) In light of this filing, the court will direct the clerk's office to amend the docket to reflect that the correct name of the defendant as "Partylite, Inc." The court also notes that plaintiff has yet to request issuance of a summons for this defendant. As for Midwest-CBK, LLC, the court will construe defendant's amended filing as a motion for leave to amend its complaint to dismiss the claims against Midwest-CBK, LLC, but will provide that defendant with an opportunity to respond to that motion. Any response is due on or before March 26, 2019. If Midwest-CBK, LLC, opposes the motion, then it should provide the names of its members and their states of citizenship in its response. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/19/2019. (kwf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against MVP Group International, Inc., Partylite, Inc., filed by Mutual of Wausau Insurance Company. (McLean, Matthew) Modified on 3/19/2019. (kwf)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall have until 3/19/2019 to file and serve a third amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/5/2019. (arw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael A. Snider for Defendants MVP Group International, Inc., Midwest-CBK, LLC. (Snider, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Defendants MVP Group International, Inc., Midwest-CBK, LLC. (Snider, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mutual of Wausau Insurance Company. (McLean, Matthew) Modified on 2/14/2019. (lak)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mutual of Wausau. (McLean, Matthew) Modified on 2/13/2019: Updated parties per Amended Complaint, etc. (lak)
February 5, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
February 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MVP Group International, Partylite Worldwide, Inc. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2402103.), filed by Mutual of Wausau, (Attachments: #1 Unsigned JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLean, Matthew) Modified on 2/1/2019: A signed and dated Civil Cover Sheet was requested. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutual of Wausau v. MVP Group International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutual of Wausau
Represented By: Matthew Scott McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutual of Wausau Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Scott McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partylite Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Group International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Group International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest-CBK, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partylite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?