Smith v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Smith
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing LLC and Biomet Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00092
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 5/15/2020. Settlement Letters due 7/31/2020. Motions in Limine due 8/14/2020. Response to Motion due 9/11/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 03:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/19/2019. (voc)
March 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/15/2019 [:15] (cak)
March 14, 2019 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance filed by Heather Campbell Burgess for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (Burgess, Heather)
March 11, 2019 Filing 104 Notice of Appearance filed by Raymond D. Rushing for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (Rushing, Raymond)
March 11, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 02:00 PM rescheduled to 3/15/2019 at 02:30 PM to accommodate the court's trial calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
March 11, 2019 Filing 103 Notice of Appearance filed by John Allen Roberts for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (Roberts, John)
March 7, 2019 Filing 102 Joint Status Report by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (Faught, Catherine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 101 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Biomet Inc., LLC. (Faught, Catherine) Modified on 2/22/2019. (lak)
February 21, 2019 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Biomet Manufacturing LLC. (Faught, Catherine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (Faught, Catherine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine A. Faught for Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (Faught, Catherine)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #95 Motion to Admit Tayjes Shah Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/6/2019. (lak)
February 6, 2019 Filing 96 Notice of Appearance filed by Keith C. Glaser for Plaintiff Nancy Smith. (Glaser, Keith)
February 6, 2019 Filing 95 Motion to Admit Tayjes Shah Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2404880.) by Plaintiff Nancy Smith. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Shah, Tayjes)
February 6, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
February 5, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
February 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 94 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:16-cv-00159. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 GROUP 2 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS transferring case to the Western District of Wisconsin, Eau Claire Division. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/18. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 92 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 82 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 79 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 75 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 73 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 72 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 65 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 62 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 57 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 28, 2017 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR APRIL 24, 2017 PRO SE HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE Brenda Fulmer appeared for the plaintiffs; John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Linder Hanig appeared for the defendants. Topics addressed included the pro se and Metal-on-Polyethylene (MoP) cases, active case count, status of discovery in Groups 3 and 4, and pending motions with actions taken in specific case as set forth in the Order. The next status conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 am (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 48 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dfts appeared by atty John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Hanig. Roland Jarquio appears on behalf of Nabileh & Ramon Jarquio (3:13cv933). The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the April 24, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 28, 2017 Filing 46 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Ahmed Diab, Brenda Fulmer, and Justin Presnal. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig, and John LaDue. The parties advised the court on the status of active/unresolved cases and discovery; indicated that they had reached an agreement regarding the composition of Group 4 for discovery purposes and would be submitting a proposed order by early April, with scheduling deadlines to be determined by the court; and confirmed that the hearing regarding management of the remaining pro se cases would proceed as scheduled on April 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). The court set the next status conference for April 24, 2017, following the pro se case management hearing. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the March 28, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER On the courts own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference currently set for February 27, 2017 is RESET for Tuesday, March 28, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR DECEMBER 15, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for 2/27/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Parties to submit proposed scheduling order re: Group 3 by Nov 11. Next status conference set for December 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (E.S.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: GROUP 3, MANAGEMENT OF PRO SE CASES, AND STATE COURT COORDINATION I OVERRULE the objection to including the Gearon case in Group 3; GRANT the motion (DE 121 in 3:15cv13) to include the Zamora case in Group 3; DECLINE to order inclusion of the ten year cases in Group 3; and propose to issue a modified Lone Pine order and letter to state judges. If no suggestions for improvement are received by November 23, I will issue the Lone Pine order and direct the letters to be sent. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
November 7, 2016 Filing 39 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plaintiffs appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward, A. Diab (by phone), J. Ward (by phone). Defendants appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Kashman. Court hears from parties. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/15/2016 at 9:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER : GRANTING 3225 PSCII's unopposed Motion to Appoint a Second Escrow Agent and Fee Committee. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER The Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Biomet are invited to provide a brief explanation for its recommendation regarding the cases to be included in Group 3. The ruling on the joint request to activate Group 3 is DEFERRED until 10/28/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER The court will DEFER ruling on the Plaintiffs Steering Committee's Motion to Appoint a Second Escrow Agent and Fee Committee ( 3225 in 3:12md2391) until 10/27/2016 to afford the individual plaintiffs time to respond or object to the motion. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
September 7, 2016 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein no longer assigned to case. (mlf) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to submit proposed order re: appointment of Escrow Agent by Sep 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Parties shall have until Sep 23, 2016 to confer, identify for the court which, if any, of the cases listed in Exhibit A should be designated as active and unsettled, and submit a proposal regarding disposition of the remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 29, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Parties to submit proposed list of cases to be included in Group 3 for case-specific discovery purposes. PSCII to submit alternative to Lone Pine order in pro se cases within 30 days; Biomet's response due 30 days after receipt. Parties to confer and submit proposed second show cause order. Ruling on Biomet's request to issue state court coordination letter 3172 deferred. Next status conference set for November 7, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (E.S.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/31/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 32 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, J. Presnal, N. Ward, A. Davis, and K. Barton for A. Diab. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, and E. Hanig. The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/29/16 STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for August 29, 2016 hearing at 11:00 a.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/25/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(lns) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The court VACATES the referral to Magistrate Judge Nuechterlein, and REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Michael Gotsch to determine any pretrial matters and to conduct such proceedings as are required, and, when appropriate, to enter into the record proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Local Rule 72-1. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 10, 2016 Filing 29 TELEPHONIC HEARING on PSC's request to extend custodial depositions deadline was held on 8/10/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab, N. Ward, J. Presnall. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated in open court the request to extend the deadline is DENIED. If previously undisclosed documents are produced in the Florida case that would justify reopening a deposition, the court will entertain a motion to reopen and to assess costs. SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT 8/10/16 DISCOVERY HEARING Call-in information for August 10, 2016 hearing at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/4/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER On the court's own motion, the telephonic status conference on 8/29/2016 is RESET for 11:00 AM (EDT) This is a time change only. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER The parties have advised the court that there are no disputed issues regarding discovery. Accordingly the July 28, 2016 telephonic hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 26, 2016 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re (3172 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN) MOTION Requesting Issuance of State Court Coordination Letter filed by Alex C Davis. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Davis PHV, Alexander) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 18, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF 7/14/2016 STATUS CONFERENCE , Following discussion the court set telephonic hearings on 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) and 8/10/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. to resolve any discovery-related issues that may arise; and set a Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/29/2016 at 11:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/18/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 14, 2016 Filing 23 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward (in person) and A. Diab and B. Fulmer by phone.. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig (in person) and J. Winter by phone. The court hears from parties. Telephonic Discovery hearings set 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) and 8/10/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Miller. Status conference set 8/29/2016 at 11:30 AM (EDT) before Judge Miller. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for July 14, 2016 status conference at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/7/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The court invites PSC-II to respond to Biomet's 3172 motion and proposed letter within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/5/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Neither party has identified a discovery-related issue requiring a hearing. Accordingly the hearing previously set for 6/27/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/24/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: JUNE 6, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Summary of topics discussed. By agreement of the parties, the May 31, 2016 order identifying the cases in Group 2 [Doc. No. 3150] is amended (revised list attached). Hearing on any discovery-related issues tentatively set for June 27, 2016 at 1:30 (will be vacated unless the parties notify the court by June 23 that the hearing is necessary and what the issues will be). Next telephonic status conference set for July 14, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/10/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 18 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/6/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab and J. Presnal by phone. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig, and J. Winter in person. Court hears from parties. A tentative Discovery Hearing is set for 6/27/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr., Status Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: Call-in information for June 6, 2016 status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The Court AFFORDS the plaintiffs listed on Exhibit A 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their individual case should not be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/26/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the May 23, 2016 telephonic hearing on discovery related issues is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/19/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: By agreement of the parties the 5/12/2016 hearing on discovery related issues is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/11/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF APRIL 25, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Defendants to submit proposed order re: dismissal of remaining settled/funded cases. Telephonic hearings set for May 12, 2016 at 9:00 am (EDT) and May 23, 2016 at 1:00 pm (EDT) to address discovery related issues, if needed. Next status conference set for June 6, 2016 at 1:30 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/26/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 25, 2016 Filing 13 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward, J. Presnal, B. Fulmer, L. Stevens. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Telephonic hearings set for May 12, 2016 at 9:00 am (EDT) and May 23, 2016 at 1:00 pm (EDT) to address discovery related issues, if needed. Next status conference set for June 6, 2016 at 1:30 pm (EDT). (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING FUTURE FILINGS To ensure notice is provided to all parties, the court's orders regarding deadlines and events applicable to every case associated with MDL 2391 will be filed in all member cases as well as in 3:12md2391. Filings made by the parties in 3:12md2391 will be available on the court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system or in the Clerk's Office, but will not be spread to individual cases unless a request is made and approved. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/14/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 13, 2016 Motion Terminated (3117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING (3117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jenya M Moshkovich PHV terminated in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/13/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 12, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by In Re Biomet M2a Magnum Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (MDL 2391). Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Moshkovich PHV, Jenya) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Based on counsels representation that the parties have reached an agreement regarding the discovery disputes addressed in the courts March 28 memorandum, the hearing scheduled for April 26, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/7/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
April 4, 2016 HEARING RESET: By agreement of the parties, the hearing previously set for 4/14/16 is RESET to 4/26/2016 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 4/5/2016 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER For all future discovery-related telephonic status conferences the court orders: 1) Parties shall notify the court in writing at least 48 hours in advance of the scheduled conference whether a conference is necessary and if so, the issues to be addressed; and 2) parties shall be responsible for notify its side's attorneys about the conference and arranging the telephonic participation of those attorneys. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 31, 2016 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF MARCH 31, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Kyle Bachus, Justin Presnal, and Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty John LaDue and John Winter. Following discussion, the court: 1) ordered counsel of record in 3:13cv1008 (Jacqueline Jones v. Biomet) and 3:14cv1482 (Mary E Stewart v. Biomet) to product to Biomet through PSC-II proposed deposition dates by 4/15/16; 2) held that if proposed deposition dates are not produced, Biomet may move for sanctions under F.R.C.P. 37(b); and 3) directed PSC-II to ensure that counsel of record in those cases receives notice of this order. (Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 21, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 18, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Nancy Smith (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]
March 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing LLC, Biomet Orthopedics LLC (Filing fee $ 400.) Receipt #3014803, filed by Nancy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 2/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: Raymond D. Rushing
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Raymond D. Rushing
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: Raymond D. Rushing
Represented By: John Allen Roberts
Represented By: Heather Campbell Burgess
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Smith
Represented By: Tayjes M Shah PHV
Represented By: Tayjes Shah
Represented By: Keith C Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?