The Estate of Trequelle Tyreke Vann-Marcouex v. Wood County
Plaintiff: The Estate of Trequelle Tyreke Vann-Marcouex
Defendant: Wood County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00094
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff The Estate of Trequelle Tyreke Vann-Marcouex. (Kinne, Paul)
March 6, 2019 Set Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wood County. (Johnson, Timothy) Modified on 3/6/2019: Undated. (lak)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel C. Hall, Jr., for Defendant Wood County. (Hall, Samuel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy M. Johnson for Defendant Wood County. (Johnson, Timothy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wood County served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Kinne, Paul)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wood County. (jat)
February 6, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
February 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wood County, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2404356.), filed by The Estate of Trequelle Tyreke Vann-Marcouex, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kinne, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Trequelle Tyreke Vann-Marcouex v. Wood County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Trequelle Tyreke Vann-Marcouex
Represented By: Dana John Wachs
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Represented By: Dana J Wachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?