The Estate of Casey Teskoski v. Wood County

Plaintiff: The Estate of Casey Teskoski
Defendant: Wood County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
0 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
1 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due 1/31/2020. Settlement Letters due 5/29/2020. Motions in Limine due 6/5/2020. Response to Motion due 6/19/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/3/19. (jat)
April 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/2/2019 [:10] (cak)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff The Estate of Casey Teskoski. (Kinne, Paul)
March 6, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wood County. (Johnson, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy M. Johnson for Defendant Wood County. (Johnson, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel C. Hall, Jr., for Defendant Wood County. (Hall, Samuel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wood County served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Kinne, Paul)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wood County. (jat)
February 6, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
February 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wood County. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2404367.), filed by The Estate of Casey Teskoski. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kinne, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Casey Teskoski v. Wood County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Casey Teskoski
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Represented By: Christine Bremer Muggli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?