June, Matthew v. State of Florida Santa Rosa County

Petitioner: Matthew A. June
Respondent: State of Florida Santa Rosa County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00103
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT is entered dismissing Matthew June's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 without prejudice. (rks),(ps)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 (dkt. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for his failure to exhaust his state court remedies. Petitioner's motion for a stay (dkt. #2 ) and for the appointment of counsel (dkt. #3 ) are DENIED as moot. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 02/28/2019. (rks),(ps)
February 26, 2019 Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 34690033962. (nln),(ps)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 02/07/2019. (rks),(ps)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Petitioner Matthew A. June. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Matthew A. June. (rks),(ps)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Matthew A. June. (rks),(ps)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Stay of Extradition Warrant Until Writ of Habeas Corpus is Resolved by Petitioner Matthew A. June. (rks),(ps)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, filed by Matthew A. June. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Documents related to Wisconsin arrest, charges, and convictions/dismissal, #2 Exhibit - Santa Rosa County Presigned Waiver of Extradition, Master Name Index Record, Letters, Court Documents and Detainer Acknowledgment, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: June, Matthew v. State of Florida Santa Rosa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Florida Santa Rosa County
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_habeas actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew A. June
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?