Newell, Ash v. Midwest Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ash Newell
Defendant: Midwest Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00107
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Midwest Communications, Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Midwest Communications, Inc. answer due 4/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/6/2019. (arw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Midwest Communications, Inc. Response due 3/13/2019. (Gregor, Jennifer)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. Copy mailed to Copyright Office. (arw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Midwest Communications, Inc. (arw)
February 15, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
February 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Midwest Communications, Inc., (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2409497) filed by Ash Newell, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - The Photograph, #2 Exhibit - Infringing Articles, #3 Exhibit - Infringing Social Media Articles, #4 Summons , #5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 2/15/2019. (arw)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The filing of the complaint in this case does not comply with Section V.D. of the court's Electronic Filing Procedures. Plaintiff has attached exhibits without a descriptive title. Counsel has been informed of this requirement in previous cases, but repeats the error. Plaintiff has seven days to resubmit the complaint in proper form, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Future non-compliance will result in sanctions. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/15/2019. (arw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 Disregard, refiled as #3 COMPLAINT. Modified on 2/15/2019. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell, Ash v. Midwest Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ash Newell
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?