Washington, James v. Novak, Sue

Petitioner: James R. Washington
Respondent: Sue Novak
Undetermined: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00119
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
0 Judge: Barbara B Crabb
1 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 34690034109. (jef),(ps)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Signature page to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James R. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's office cover letter) (jef),(ps)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing petitioner to submit $5 filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and Trust Fund Account Statement by 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/14/2019. (jef),(ps)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to petitioner from the Clerk's Office regarding unsigned #1 submission. (jef),(ps)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner James R. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Envelope, letter, #2 Exhibits B-C - Newspaper articles) (jef),(ps)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 Petition (see dkt. #5 for signature) for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, filed by James R. Washington. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-23 - Docket sheet, 2008cf3382, decisions, other documents, #2 Cover Letter) (jef) Modified docket text on 2/19/2019 (jef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington, James v. Novak, Sue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James R. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sue Novak
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_habeas actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?