Clark, Noah v. Reinikain, Kevin et al

Plaintiff: Noah Dabe Clark
Defendant: Officer Kevin Reinikain and Mulitple Unknown Rice Lake Police Officers/Deputys
Case Number: 3:2019cv00140
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/12/2019. (rks),(ps)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Noah Dabe Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from clerk's office to plaintiff regarding the court does not accept filings via facsimile. (rks),(ps)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Noah Dabe Clark may have until 3/13/2019 to file an amended Financial Affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 02/20/2019. (rks),(ps)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Noah Dabe Clark. (rks),(ps)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mulitple Unknown Rice Lake Police Officers/Deputys, Kevin Reinikain, filed by Noah Dabe Clark. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Fax Coversheet) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark, Noah v. Reinikain, Kevin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kevin Reinikain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulitple Unknown Rice Lake Police Officers/Deputys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Dabe Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?